IL HR0522 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-26 - Resolution Adopted 106-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-26 - Resolution Adopted 106-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Auditor General to conduct a performance audit of the procurement and administration of the contract with Morneau Shepell.
Title
MORNEAU SHEPELL - AUDIT GEN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-26 - House - Motion in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-26 | House | Resolution Adopted 106-000-000 |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-10-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-10-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000 |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-07-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-07-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-06-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Al Riley |