IL HR0497 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-2)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes the week of November 13-19, 2023 as National Apprenticeship Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NATIONAL APPRENTICESHIP WEEK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
2023-11-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
2023-11-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2023-11-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2023-11-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
2023-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
2023-11-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
2023-11-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Harry Benton

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback