IL HR0490 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Governor Rauner to immediately join the United States Climate Alliance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

U.S. CLIMATE ALLIANCE - JOIN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-06-26HouseResolution Adopted 054-029-000
2017-06-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-06-24HouseRecommends Be Adopted Energy Committee; 008-002-000
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-06-24HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-06-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-06-23HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-06-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-06-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-06-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-06-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-06-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-06-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-06-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-06-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-06-23HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-06-23HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Energy Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-06-23HouseAssigned to Energy Committee
2017-06-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-06-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback