IL HR0485 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on October 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-28 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on October 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-28 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares October of 2021 as Hindu Heritage Month.
Title
HINDU HERITAGE MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-10-28 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-10-28 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-10-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-10-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-10-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-10-22 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=485&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0485.htm |