IL HR0479 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requests that no State or local government agency or official should expend any time, facilities, equipment, information, or other resources of the agency or official to facilitate the creation, publication, or maintenance of or any participation in any federal program with the purpose of registering or maintaining a database of individuals present in the United States based on their race, color, ancestry, national origin, or religion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NO NATIONAL REGISTRY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-06-23HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback