IL HR0445 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges opposition to the American Health Care Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AM. HEALTH CARE ACT-OPPOSE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-06-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-06-22HouseRecommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 010-000-001
2017-06-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-06-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-05-30HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback