IL HR0434 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Governor to create the Unsung Heroes State Employee Program that instructs department heads to nominate an employee each month to acknowledge outstanding efforts.
Title
RECOGNIZE - STATE EMPLOYEES
Sponsors
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-25 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-06-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-06-23 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-06-23 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-06-23 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=434&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0434.htm |