IL HR0430 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes July 2, 2017 as Lions Day in Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIONS DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-06-26HouseResolution Adopted
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-06-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-06-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-06-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-06-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-06-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-06-24HouseRecommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-06-23HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-06-23HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-06-23HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-05-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback