IL HR0429 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the month of November as COPD Awareness Month in the State of Illinois.
Title
COPD AWARENESS MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-30 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2015-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-05-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2015-05-25 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2015-05-25 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-05-25 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=429&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0429.htm |