IL HR0424 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares the month of May of 2019 as "Cystic Fibrosis Awareness Month" in the State of Illinois.
Title
CF AWARENESS MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-29 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-29 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-05-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=424&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0424.htm |