IL HR0424 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the 29th day of April as 40-to-None-Day (aka #40toNoneDay) in the State of Illinois and calls upon citizens, government agencies, the business community, service providers, advocates, LGBT youth, and elected officials of this State to increase awareness of LGBT youth homelessness and to engage in efforts to end homelessness, thereby strengthening the communities in which we live.
Title
40-TO-NONE-DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-05-30 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-05-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2015-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2015-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2015-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-05-21 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=424&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0424.htm |