IL HR0416 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the General Assembly to take action to modernize its early childhood education funding and teacher qualification standards to address the early childhood workforce crisis. Urges the Governor of Illinois to increase early childhood education provider representation on the Illinois Learning Council, the DCFS Daycare Advisory Council, the DHS Childcare Advisory Council, and the Professional Development Advisory Council to assure provider voices are heard as early childhood education policy is developed and implemented.
Title
EARLY CHILDHOOD ED CRISIS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 007-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2019-05-30 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-30 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-30 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-05-29 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-05-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=416&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0416.htm |