IL HR0401 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares May of 2017 to be Community Action Awareness Month in the State of Illinois to commemorate the 53rd anniversary of the Decatur Macon County Opportunities Corporation.
Title
DMCOC - COMMUNITY ACTION MONTH
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Scherer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-25 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-05-23 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Economic Opportunity Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Economic Opportunity Committee; Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-05-22 | House | Assigned to Economic Opportunity Committee |
2017-05-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=401&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0401.htm |