IL HR0390 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Commission on the Social Status of Black Males to study the social conditions of black males, develop strategies to remedy or assist in remedying serious adversities, and make recommendations to improve the educational, social, economic, and employment opportunities of black males.
Title
SOCIAL STATUS-BLACK MALES
Sponsors
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Rep. Yehiel Kalish [D] | Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] |
Rep. Lamont Robinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-06-01 | House | Resolution Adopted 111-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=390&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0390.htm |