IL HR0389 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on June 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Encourages the Illinois Department of Employment Security to create a website modeled after the State of Missouri's "Show Me Heroes" website to help put more veterans back to work.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ENCOURAGE IDES-SHOW ME HEROES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-06-25HouseResolution Adopted
2017-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-05-23HouseRecommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 009-000-000
2017-05-22HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-05-22HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Veterans' Affairs Committee; Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-22HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback