IL HR0372 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
States that the State of Illinois should work to maximize the creation of American jobs and to stimulate economic growth and opportunity by spending Illinois taxpayer dollars on iron and steel that creates jobs and helps keep Americans employed.
Title
BUY AMERICAN STEEL
Sponsors
Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst [R] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] |
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-25 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-05-23 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000 |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Labor & Commerce Committee; Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-05-22 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-05-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=372&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0372.htm |