IL HR0372 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-10)
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-31 - Resolution Adopted 112-002-001
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-10)
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-31 - Resolution Adopted 112-002-001
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the new building at the Illinois Fire Service Institute as the "Richard L. Jaehne Building" in honor of Mr. Jaehne and his many accomplishments as director of the Illinois Fire Service Institute.
Title
RICHARD L. JAEHNE BUILDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | House | Resolution Adopted 112-002-001 |
2011-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Barickman |
2011-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2011-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2011-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2011-05-29 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000 |
2011-05-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed |
2011-05-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Chapin Rose |
2011-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2011-05-27 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-05-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2011-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons |
2011-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2011-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2011-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz |
2011-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook |
2011-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Biss |
2011-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2011-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly Burke |
2011-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2011-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano |
2011-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2011-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2011-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2011-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2011-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Cunningham |
2011-05-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross |
2011-05-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2011-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=372&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR0372.htm |