IL HR0366 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares the week of May 7-13, 2017 as "World Falun Dafa Week".
Title
WORLD FALUN DAFA WEEK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | Tabled |
2017-05-18 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-17 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2017-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-05-09 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Economic Opportunity Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned to Economic Opportunity Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=366&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0366.htm |