IL HR0364 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-26 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-26 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the citizens of Illinois to educate themselves on the signs and types of companion animal cruelty so that they can report it when they see it.
Title
ANIMAL CRUELTY - REPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | House | Tabled |
2017-06-26 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-05-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-05-18 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=364&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0364.htm |