IL HR0361 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates July 3, 2017 and July 3, 2018 as Illinois Citizens Re-entry Day, to be observed in recognition of Congressman Danny K. Davis' work in helping to provide ex-offenders with a second chance and opportunity to re-enter society as productive citizens, and to encourage continuing support of such citizens as they re-enter their communities.
Title
CITIZENS REENTRY DAY ILLINOIS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-06-25 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-06-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-06-25 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-06-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-06-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-06-25 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-06-25 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-05-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Restorative Justice Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Restorative Justice Committee; Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-05-22 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=361&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0361.htm |