IL HR0345 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the federal government to consider the Illinois State Capitol Complex to be critical infrastructure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ILCAP-CRITICAL INFRASTRUCTURE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-06-25HouseResolution Adopted
2017-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-05-17HouseRecommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback