IL HR0344 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
States opposition to the proposed change of the Determination of Need Score minimum threshold from 29 to 37, which would result in thousands of people with disabilities and seniors being left without critical support for activities of daily living in their own homes. Urges the Governor and the Illinois Department of Human Services to withdraw any and all plans to amend the Medicaid State plan to change the Determination of Need score requirements.
Title
OPPOSE DNS SCORE CHANGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-05-06 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-04-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-04-28 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-004-001 |
2015-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-04-20 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2015-04-16 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2015-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2015-04-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=344&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0344.htm |