IL HR0335 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the President of the United States and Congress to review the national tariff policy on steel goods and take action similar to the 2002 actions of President George W. Bush and Congress.
Title
STEEL TARIFF - REVIEW
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Dwight Kay [R] |
Rep. Katherine Cloonen [D] | Rep. Mike Smiddy [D] | Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. Patrick Verschoore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2015-05-06 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-04-29 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-000-000 |
2015-04-20 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2015-03-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-03-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=335&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0335.htm |