IL HR0334 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes the valiant work of those associated with the Boy Scouts of America Iroquois Trail district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RECOGNIZE - SCOUTS-IROQUOIS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-25HouseResolution Adopted
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Agreed Resolutions
2017-04-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback