IL HR0325 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expresses a commitment to the security of the State of Israel and supports its right to self-defense. States the belief that Hamas must end Gaza-linked attacks against Israel, must recognize Israel's right to exist, must renounce violence, and must agree to accept previous agreements between Israel and the Palestinians.
Title
SUPPORT ISRAEL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-24 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 073-042-000 |
2021-05-24 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-24 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-05-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chris Miller |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=325&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0325.htm |