IL HR0314 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Acknowledges the importance of having a high quality education system and all of the societal benefits that go along with it. Encourages the General Assembly to make education a priority in the Fiscal Year 2018 budget, fully fund elementary and secondary education, and continue to strive to create an adequately funded and high quality education system for the benefit of all citizens. Encourages the business community to advocate for a high quality education system in Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC EDUCATION PRIORITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-06-22HouseResolution Adopted
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-05-24HouseRecommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 019-000-000
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2017-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-20HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback