IL HR0304 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Encourages all officers and employees of the Illinois State Board of Education, the Illinois Department of Human Services, the Administrative Office of the Courts, and the Illinois Department of Corrections to become informed regarding well-documented detrimental short-term and long-term impacts to children and adults from serious traumatic childhood experiences; and implement evidence-based interventions and practices that are proven to be successful in developing resiliency in children and adults currently suffering from trauma-related disorders to help them recover from their trauma and function at their full capacity and potential in school, the workplace, and community, family, and interpersonal relationships.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHILDHOOD TRAUMA - SURVIVORS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-05-16HouseRecommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 016-000-000
2017-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Al Riley

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback