IL HR0296 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois General Assembly to create the Opioid Settlement Fund, created as a special fund in the State Treasury to receive opioid-related settlement funds to which the State of Illinois may be entitled under any opioid-related settlement.
Title
OPIOID SETTLEMENT FUND-CREATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-03-16 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2022-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2022-03-15 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-05-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 016-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 073-042-000 |
2021-05-24 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-24 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-05-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=296&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0296.htm |