IL HR0272 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-16)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
States opposition to any additional excise taxes on Illinois businesses that produce beer, wine, or liquor or their related industries.
Title
NO NEW EXCISE TAXES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-12 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-05-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=272&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0272.htm |