IL HR0271 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April 26, 2017 and 2018 as the "Annual Alzheimer's Association Advocacy Day" in the State of Illinois.
Title
ALZHEIMER'S ADVOCACY DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-05-11 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-04-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-000-000 |
2017-04-18 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=271&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0271.htm |