IL HR0268 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
Pending: House Agriculture & Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares April 30, 2021 to be Therapy Animal Day in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

THERAPY ANIMAL DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-05-12HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2021-05-05HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-05-04HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback