IL HR0268 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges President Trump and the United States Congress to fully fund the Great Lakes Restoration Initiative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GREAT LAKES RESTORATION - FUND

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-06-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-06-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-06-22HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-06-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-06-22HouseResolution Adopted
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-04-27HouseRecommends Be Adopted Environment; 018-000-000
2017-04-18HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-04-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-03-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback