IL HR0267 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares Southern Illinois as the "Eclipse Crossroads of America" and August 21, 2017 as "Great American Eclipse Day 2017".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SO IL ECLIPSE DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-06-22HouseResolution Adopted
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-04-26HouseRecommends Be Adopted Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee; 008-000-000
2017-04-18HouseAssigned to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee
2017-04-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-03-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback