IL HR0267 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares Southern Illinois as the "Eclipse Crossroads of America" and August 21, 2017 as "Great American Eclipse Day 2017".
Title
SO IL ECLIPSE DAY
Sponsors
Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] |
Rep. Dave Severin [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-06-22 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-04-26 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee; 008-000-000 |
2017-04-18 | House | Assigned to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-03-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=267&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0267.htm |