IL HR0261 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Opposes any new regulations for energy drinks.
Title
ENERGY DRINKS - NO NEW REGS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-04-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-04-18 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=261&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0261.htm |