IL HR0255 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares May of 2023 as Motorcycle Awareness Month in the State of Illinois. Recognizes the 36 years of ABATE of Illinois, Inc., the more than 352,318 registered motorcyclists statewide, and the continued role that Illinois serves as a leader in motorcycle safety, education, and awareness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MOTORCYCLE AWARENESS MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
2023-05-18HouseResolution Adopted
2023-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2023-05-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
2023-05-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2023-05-16HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 007-000-000
2023-05-08HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
2023-05-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
2023-05-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-05-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback