IL HR0251 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares May 2023 as Asthma Awareness Month in the State of Illinois. Expresses support for the 2021-2026 Illinois Asthma State Plan, which strives to improve and expand asthma care, education, and self-management strategies in Illinois.
Title
ASTHMA AWARENESS MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2023-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-05-16 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Public Health Committee; 007-000-000 |
2023-05-08 | House | Assigned to Public Health Committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=251&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0251.htm |