IL HR0250 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes May of 2017 as Foster Care Month in Illinois.
Title
FOSTER CARE MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor All Other Members of the House |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-04-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-000-000 |
2017-04-18 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=250&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0250.htm |