IL HR0247 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges fire departments and other public safety agencies to analyze the culture of their respective department and to ensure a culture is in place that promotes training, communication, and accountability in order to help mitigate the NIOSH 5 from occurring. Urges fire departments to continue to critique their response after fires, to learn from past experiences, and to include in their culture and procedures open discussions about the NIOSH 5, studying NIOSH reports as a crew, and utilization of the Firefighter Near Miss Reporting System. Pledges to support the State's firefighters, fire departments, and public safety agencies in this endeavor. Recognizes that the continued deaths and injuries of our brave firefighters and first responders are a stark reminder of the importance of reiterating the basic concepts of firefighting and that the top five occupational factors distinctly show that a fire department's culture can lead to line-of-duty deaths (LODDs).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

URGES-FD CULTURE CHANGE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
2023-05-24HouseResolution Adopted
2023-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2023-05-16HouseRecommends Be Adopted Police & Fire Committee; 014-000-000
2023-05-08HouseAssigned to Police & Fire Committee
2023-05-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-05-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback