IL HR0247 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the date of May 10, 2017 as Alpha Kappa Alpha Day in the State of Illinois in honor of Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Incorporated, and its work.
Title
ALPHA KAPPA ALPHA DAY
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor All Other Members of the House |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-04-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-04-18 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=247&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0247.htm |