IL HR0244 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares May 28, 2017 as a day of remembrance for the 1917 East St. Louis Race Riot.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

1917 EST STL RIOTS-REMEMBER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-04-25HouseRecommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-04-18HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-03-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-03-28HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback