IL HR0225 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Resolution Adopted as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Resolution Adopted as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes World Preeclampsia Day.
Title
WORLD PREECLAMPSIA DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Resolution Adopted as Amended |
2019-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-08 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |