IL HR0221 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares September 7, 2019 as Great Lakes-St. Lawrence Appreciation Day in Illinois.
Title
GREAT LAKES APPRECIATION DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-05-16 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-03 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-05-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-05-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-04-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 028-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=221&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0221.htm |