IL HR0216 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the federal government to allocate more funding toward finding a cure for Lyme disease. Declares May 2023 as Lyme Disease Awareness Month in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LYME DISEASE AWARENESS MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-18HouseResolution Adopted
2023-05-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2023-05-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2023-05-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
2023-05-03HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2023-05-03HouseRecommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000
2023-04-25HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2023-04-20HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-04-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Swanson

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback