IL HR0212 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Opposes the concept of a privilege tax on financial transactions.
Title
NO FINANCIAL TRANSACTIONS TAX
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-03-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=212&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0212.htm |