IL HR0189 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Condemns the expulsion of Tennessee State Representatives Justin Jones and Justin Pearson and condemns the attempted expulsion of Tennessee State Rep. Gloria Johnson from the Tennessee House of Representatives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TENN. HOUSE EXPULSION-CONDEMN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2023-06-26HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
2023-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
2023-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2023-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2023-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2023-04-26HouseRecommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 006-003-000
2023-04-18HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2023-04-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-04-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Cyril Nichols

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback