IL HR0177 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commends the valiant efforts of the Aurora Police Department, the Aurora Fire Department, 9-1-1 operators, and the numerous other law enforcement agencies and first responders for the incredible resilience they showed during the tragic events that took place on February 15, 2019 at the Henry Pratt Company.
Title
COMMEND-AURORA 1ST RESPONDERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor All Other Members of the House |
2019-03-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=177&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0177.htm |