IL HR0174 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges every Illinois municipality and county to cut 10% of funding to law enforcement agencies that do not adopt and comply with an appropriately robust reform program. Urges municipalities and counties to review municipal and county codes for the over-criminalization of minor offenses and the criminalization of poverty or other status. Details steps to reform policing procedures.
Title
LAW ENFORCEMENT REFORM-FUNDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-04-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-005-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=174&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0174.htm |