IL HR0169 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the United States Congress to approve the Education Freedom Scholarships and Opportunity Act, so that children and their families are able to make decision about education that are most beneficial. Urges Governor Pritzker to allow the Invest in Kids Act to be in full effect for the five years of the pilot program as intended by this General Assembly upon passage of the Evidence-Based Funding for Student Success Act.
Title
INVEST IN KIDS ACT PILOT PROG
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=169&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0169.htm |