IL HR0165 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that Public Act 101-237 is named Ta'Naja's Law.
Title
TA'NAJA'S LAW
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-04-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 006-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-04-20 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=165&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0165.htm |